No. 20-317
Title:Dakai Chavis, Petitioner
v.
Delaware
Docketed:September 10, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Delaware
   Case Numbers:(520, 2018)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2020Waiver of right of respondent Delaware to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)
Oct 28 2020Brief of respondent Delaware in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Nov 05 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 17, 2020 to November 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until November 24, 2020 granted.
Nov 20 2020Reply of petitioner Dakai Chavis filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Dakai Chavis
Nicole M. WalkerOffice of the Public Defender, State of Delaware
Carvel State Building, 3rd Floor
820 N. French Street
Wilmington, DE 19801

nicole.walker@delaware.gov
3024633537
Party name: Dakai Chavis
Attorneys for Respondent
Maria Teresa Knoll
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney GeneralState of Delaware,
820 N. French Street, 7th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801

maria.knoll@delaware.gov
302-577-8826
Party name: Delaware