No. 20-315
Title:Jose Santos Sanchez, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:September 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1311)
   Decision Date:July 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Corrected appendix to the petition (submitted February 18, 2021).
Main Document
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to November 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2020.
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2020 to December 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 9, 2020.
Dec 09 2020Brief for the Respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Feb 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jose Santos Sanchez, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Jose Santos Sanchez, et al.
Main DocumentMain Document
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioners Jose Santos Sanchez, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Oxfam America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Watch and Alianza Americas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Alan Morrison and Brian Wolfman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of National Immigration Litigation Alliance, American Civil Liberties Union, and Northwest Immigrant Rights Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Harvard TPS Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of 22 Cities and Counties filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Amicus brief of Service Employees International Union, et al. not accepted for filing. (March 03, 2021 - certificate of compliance to be corrected).
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Service Employees International Union and Other Labor Unions filed. (March 23, 2021)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Corrected certificate of service for amicus curiae Harvard TPS Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 19, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondents Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2021Reply of Jose Santos Sanchez, et ux. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jaime Winthuysen Aparisi
    Counsel of Record
819 Silver Spring Ave.
Silver Spring, MD 20910

jaime@aparisi.com
301-562-1416
Party name: Jose Santos Sanchez, et ux.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Other
Sameer Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
6 Everett Street
Cambridge, MA 02138

sahmed@law.harvard.edu
617-384-0088
Party name: Harvard TPS Coalition
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia, Massachusetts, and 18 other states.
Margaret Louise Carter
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
400 South Hope Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mcarter@omm.com
213-430-7592
Party name: 22 Cities and Counties
Ethan Douglas Dettmer
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
555 Mission St., Suite 3000
San Francisco, CA 94105

edettmer@gibsondunn.com
(415) 393-8292
Party name: Immigration Law Professors
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Emily Johnson Henn
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
Salesforce Tower
415 Mission St., Suite 5400
San Francisco, CA 94105

ehenn@cov.com
(650) 632-4715
Party name: Oxfam America
Jennifer Michelle Keighley
    Counsel of Record
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 W. 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jkeighley@orrick.com
(212) 506-3584
Party name: Professors Alan Morrison and Brian Wolfman
Erica Courtney Lai
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Gresser LLP
2001 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

elai@cohengresser.com
2028512073
Party name: Service Employees International Union and Other Labor Unions
Joel W. Nomkin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
2901 North Central Avenue
Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

jnomkin@perkinscoie.com
602.351.8185
Party name: National Immigration Litigation Alliance, American Civil Liberties Union, and Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
Reedy Charles Swanson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20004

reedy.swanson@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5764
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association, National Immigrant Justice Center, and American Friends Service Committee
Rishi Nachiketa Zutshi
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
1 Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

rzutshi@cgsh.com
212-225-2085
Party name: Human Rights Watch and Alianza Americas