No. 20-310
Title:Robert James Keach, Estate Representative of Post-Effective Date Estate of Montreal, Maine, and Atlantic Railway, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
New Brunswick Southern Railway Company, Ltd., et al.
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1161)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2020Brief of respondents New Brunswick Southern Railway Company Limited and Maine Northern Railway Company in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2020Reply of Robert James Keach, Estate Representative of the Post-Effective Date Estate of Montreal, Maine, and Atlantic Railway, Ltd. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Danielle Mary Spinelli
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6901
Party name: Robert James Keach, Estate Representative of the Post-Effective Date Estate of Montreal, Maine, and Atlantic Railway, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondents
Alan Roger Lepene
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Hine LLP
127 Public Square, Suite 3900
Cleveland, OH 44114

alan.lepene@thompsonhine.com
216-566-5520
Party name: New Brunswick Southern Railway Company Limited and Maine Northern Railway Company
James Joseph HendersonThompson Hine LLP
3900 Key Center, 127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

james.henderson@thompsonhine.com
216-566-5731
Party name: New Brunswick Southern Railway Company Limited and Maine Northern Railway Company