No. 20-304
Title:World Programming Limited, Petitioner
v.
SAS Institute, Inc.
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1290, 19-1300)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to December 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562000
Party name: World Programming Limited
Attorneys for Respondent
Pressly McAuley Millen
    Counsel of Record
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
555 Fayetteville Street Mall
Suite 1100
Raleigh, NC 27601

press.millen@wbd-us.com
919-755-215
Party name: SAS Institute, Inc.