No. 20-303
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Jose Luis Vaello-Madero
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1390)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Carlos Delgado Altieri, Mayor of the Municipality of Isabela, Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Gregorio Igartua (11/17/2020) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Plaintiffs in Peña Martínez v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Response to petition from respondent Jose Luis Vaello-Madero filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Virgin Islands Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021Petition GRANTED.
Mar 17 2021Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 1, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 16, 2021.
May 27 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Letter of supplement to request for further extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including June 7, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits if further extended to and including August 30, 2021.
Jun 07 2021Brief of petitioner United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Interamerican Institute for Constitutional Rights in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Informative of Gregorio Igartua not accepted for filing. (July 23, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Attorneys for Respondent
Hermann Ferre
    Counsel of Record
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt and Mosle LLP
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

hferre@curtis.com
2126968871
Party name: Jose Luis Vaello-Madero
Other
Dwyer Stenquist Arce
    Counsel of Record
Kutak Rock LLP
1650 Farnam Street
The Omaha Building
Omaha, NE 68102

Dwyer.Arce@KutakRock.com
402.346.6000
Party name: Virgin Islands Bar Association
Manuel Del Valle
    Counsel of Record
Interamerican Institute for Constitutional Rights
Urb. Industrial Calle Federico Costa #170
Interamerican School of Law
Hato Rey, PR 00918-1303

mdelvalle@juris.inter.edu
7877511912
Party name: Interamerican Institute for Constitutional Rights
Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
    Counsel of Record
Hernandez Mayoral Law Offices
206 Tetuan
Suite 702
San Juan, PR 00901

jose@hernandezmayoral.com
787-607-4867
Party name: Carlos Delgado Altieri, Mayor of the Municipality of Isabela, Puerto Rico
Gregorio IgartuaBox 3911
Aguadilla, PR 00605

bufeteigartua@yahoo.com
(787) 379-5095
Party name: Gregorio Igartua
Carlos Lugo-Fiol
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 260150
San Juan, PR 00926

clugofiol@gmail.com
(787) 645-4211
Party name: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Plaintiffs in Peña Martínez v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services