No. 20-301 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Timothy B. Hennis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0263)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Air Force Appellate Defense Division filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Gerard Burroughs Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Defense Appellate Division, United States Army Legal Services Agency
9275 Gunston Road
Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

timothy.g.burroughs.mil@mail.mil
7036930656
Party name: Timothy B. Hennis
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Mark Clifford Bruegger
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Air Force
1500 W. Perimeter Road
Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews, MD 20762

mark.bruegger.1@us.af.mil
2406124770
Party name: Air Force Appellate Defense Division