No. 20-298
Title:El Paso County, Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-51144)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to November 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 17, 2020.
Nov 17 2020Brief of respondents Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 23 2020Reply of El Paso County, Texas, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: El Paso County, Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.