No. 20-297
Title:TransUnion LLC, Petitioner
v.
Sergio L. Ramirez
Docketed:September 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17244)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2020 to November 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 6, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2020Brief of respondent Sergio L. Ramirez in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner TransUnion LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Dec 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Sergio L. Ramirez
Blanket Consent
Dec 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, TransUnion LLC
Blanket Consent
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 30, 2021.
Feb 01 2021Brief of petitioner TransUnion LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Joint appendix (Volumes I, II, & III) filed. (Statement of cost filed).
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Feb 04 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of eBay Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of The Home Depot, Inc. et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professional Background Screening Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Consumer Reporting Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of ACA International filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of the United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Mar 03 2021Brief of Sergio L. Ramirez not accepted for filing. (March 05, 2021)(Dupilicate submission)
Mar 03 2021Brief of respondent Sergio L. Ramirez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Consumer Advocates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Complex Litigation Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Impact Fund, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., and 24 Civil Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Committee to Support the Antitrust Laws filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of UC Berkeley Center for Consumer Law and Economic Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 19 2021Reply of petitioner TransUnion LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2021Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Nicole F. Reaves, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Samuel Issacharoff, New York, N. Y.
Jun 25 2021Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Alito, Gorsuch, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Kagan, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined.
Jul 27 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: TransUnion LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Issacharoff
    Counsel of Record
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

si13@nyu.edu
2129986580
Party name: Sergio Ramirez
James Arthur FrancisFrancis Mailman Soumilas, P.C.
1600 Market Street, Suite 2510
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jfrancis@consumerlawfirm.com
(215) 735-8600
Party name: Sergio L. Ramirez
Andrew J. OgilvieOgilvie & Brewer, LLP
3450 Sacramento St., #413
San Francisco, CA 94118

andy@ogilvie-brewer.com
(415) 378-4838
Party name: Sergio L. Ramirez
Other
John Gerard Albanese
    Counsel of Record
Berger Montague PC
43 SE Main Street, Suite 505
Minneapolis, MN 55414

jalbanese@bm.net
612-594-5997
Party name: National Consumer Law Center, et al.
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Patrick Joseph Carome
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

patrick.carome@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6600
Party name: eBay Inc., Facebook Inc., Google LLC, Computer & Communications Industry Ass’n, The Internet Ass’n, and Technology Network
Pamela Quigley Devata
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000
Chicago, IL 60606

pdevata@seyfarth.com
312-460-5000
Party name: Professional Background Screening Association
Jeffrey Scott Gentes
    Counsel of Record
Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization/Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

jeffrey.gentes@yale.edu
2034324800
Party name: UC Berkeley Center for Consumer Law and Economic Justice, Demos, and Housing Clinic of Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization at Yale Law School
Karla Ann Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice, P.C.
1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
2027978600
Party name: Public Justice
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
(202) 783-8400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Robert Samuel Kitchenoff
    Counsel of Record
Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC
150 Monument Road, Suite 107
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19107

kitchenoff@wka-law.com
2155457200
Party name: The Committee to Support the Antitrust Laws
Jocelyn D. Larkin
    Counsel of Record
Impact Fund
2080 Addison Street
Suite 5
Berkeley, CA 94704

jlarkin@impactfund.org
(510) 845-3473
Party name: Impact Fund, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., and 24 Civil Rights Organizations
Christi A. Lawson
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
111 N. Orange Ave., Suite 1800
Orlando, FL 32801

clawson@foley.com
407-244-3235
Party name: National Consumer Reporting Association, Inc.
Travis Dean Lenkner
    Counsel of Record
Keller Lenkner LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2570
Chciago, IL 60606

tdl@kellerlenkner.com
312-741-5223
Party name: Legal Scholars
Adam J. Levitt
    Counsel of Record
Dicello Levitt Gutzler LLC
Ten North Dearborn Street, 6th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

alevitt@dicellolevitt.com
312-214-7900
Party name: National Association of Consumer Advocates
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: The Home Depot, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group
James Allen Moseley
    Counsel of Record
Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.
1601 Elm St. Suite 4600
Dallas, TX 75201

jmoseley@grayreed.com
2149544135
Party name: ACA International
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
James Joseph Pizzirusso
    Counsel of Record
Hausfeld LLP
888 16th Street, N.W.
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

jpizzirusso@hausfeld.com
202-540-7200
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Elizabeth B. PrelogarActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Cecily Claire Shiel
    Counsel of Record
Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC
1700 Seventh Avenue, Suite 2200
Seattle, WA 98101

cshiel@tousley.com
(206) 695-9291
Party name: Complex Litigation Law Professors
Charles Robert Stinson
    Counsel of Record
The Cullen Law Firm, PLLC
1101 30th St NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20007

crs@cullenlaw.com
2029448600
Party name: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc.
John Mark Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Dykema Gossett PLLC
2723 South State Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

jthomas@dykema.com
734-214-7613
Party name: The Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
3127595947
Party name: Consumer Data Industry Association
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: American Association for Justice