No. 20-293
Title:Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
New Mexico, ex rel. Hector Balderas, Attorney General
Docketed:September 8, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New Mexico
   Case Numbers:(A-1-CA-36906)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 11, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2020 to November 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 5, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Catherine Hancock Dorsey
    Counsel of Record
Baron & Budd
600 New Hampshire Ave., NW, 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20037

cdorsey@baronbudd.com
202-286-4835
Party name: State of New Mexico ex rel. Hector Balderas, Attorney General