No. 20-283
Title:Austin J. Bass, Petitioner
v.
Patrick M. Greve, et al.
Docketed:September 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6069)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Waiver of right of respondent Patrick Greve, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 13 2020Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2020)
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2020 to November 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 24, 2020.
Nov 24 2020Brief of Patrick Greve in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allison L. Bussell
    Counsel of Record
Metropolitan Gov. of Nashville and Davidson County
108 Metropoliton Courthouse
Department of Law
Nashville, TN 37219

allison.bussell@nashville.gov
6158803759
Party name: Austin Bass
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas W. Condit
    Counsel of Record
Thomas W. Condit, Attorney at Law
P.O. Box 12700
Cincinnati, OH 45212

twcondit@fuse.net
(513) 284-9260
Party name: Patrick Greve, et al.
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8497
Party name: Patrick Greve