No. 20-28
Title:PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al., Petitioners
v.
Timothy Laurent, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:July 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-487-cv)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 12, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2020.
Aug 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, The American Benefits Council, and The Business Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2020Brief of respondents Timothy Laurent, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Reply of petitioners PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8257
Party name: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Leon Dayan
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th St. N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

ldayan@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Timothy Laurent, et al.
Other
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States, The American Benefits Council, and The Business Roundtable