No. 20-276
Title:Christopher M. Gibson, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission, et al.
Docketed:September 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11969)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 5, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Christopher Gibson
Blanket Consent
Oct 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2020 to November 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 05 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020Motion of Pacific Legal Foundation for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (October 08, 2020)
Oct 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of George R. Jarkesy, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, the Competitive Enterprise Institute, and the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Christopher Gibson
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission, et al.
Other
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: George R. Jarkesy, Jr.
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Boulevard
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

odunford@pacificlegal.org
561.691.5000
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: The Cato Institute, the Competitive Enterprise Institute, and the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America