No. 20-273 Vide 20-271, 20-414, 20-74, 20-92 | |
Title: | Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Petitioner v. Rovi Guides, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | September 2, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1215, 2019-1216, 2019-1218, 2019-1293, 2019-1294, 2019-1295) |
Decision Date: | April 22, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 28 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 21 2020 | Memorandum of respondent Rovi Guides, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 20 2020 | Reply of petitioner Comcast Cable Communications, LLC filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 13 2020 | Motion of petitioner to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant Rule 46.2 filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 17 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. |
Dec 03 2020 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Suite 500E Washington, DC 20001-5369 donald.verrilli@mto.com | 202-220-1101 |
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Michael E. Joffre Counsel of Record | STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C. 1100 New York Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20005 mjoffre@sternekessler.com | 202-772-8856 |
Party name: Rovi Guides, Inc. | ||
Jeffrey B. Wall Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |