No. 20-272
Title:Maryland, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jimmie Rogers
Docketed:September 2, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(32, September Term, 2019)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2020 to December 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 1, 2020.