No. 20-261
Title:Jeff Schulz, et al., Petitioners
v.
Presbytery of Seattle. et al.
Docketed:September 2, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
   Case Numbers:(78399-8-1)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 1, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2020 to November 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2020.
Sep 21 2020Response to motion from petitioners Jeff Schulz, et al. filed.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Anglican Church in North America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Law and Religion and Constitutional Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2020Brief of respondents The Presbytery of Seattle, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Reply of petitioners Jeff Schulz, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: Jeff Schulz, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Bertelson Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2900
Seattle, WA 98104-1158

rob.mitchell@klgates.com
(206) 623-7580
Party name: The Presbytery of Seattle, et al.
Other
Luke W. Goodrich
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lgoodrich@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Ryan Thomas Holt
    Counsel of Record
Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC
150 3rd Avenue South, Suite 1100
Nashville, TN 37201

rholt@srvhlaw.com
(615) 742-4200
Party name: Anglican Church in North America
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

pzidlicky@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Law and Religion and Constitutional Law Professors