No. 20-260 | |
Title: | Personal Audio, LLC, Petitioner v. CBS Corporation |
Docketed: | September 1, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2018-2256) |
Decision Date: | January 10, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 1, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 01 2020 | Brief of respondent CBS Corporation in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 21 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020. |
Nov 09 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Papool Subhash Chaudhari Counsel of Record | Chaudhari Law, PLLC P.O. Box 1863 Wylie, TX 75098 papool@chaudharilaw.com | 2147021150 |
Party name: Personal Audio LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Steven Lieberman Counsel of Record | Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, P.C. 607 14th St., NW Suite 800 Washington, DC 20005 slieberman@rfem.com | 202-783-6040 |
Party name: CBS Corporation |