No. 20-257
Title:Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Maxcimo Scott, et al.
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2208, 18-359)
   Decision Date:April 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2020 to October 31, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
Sep 15 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 16 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Maxcimo Scott, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., And Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Wage & Hour Defense Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2020Brief of respondents Maxcimo Scott, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 17 2020Reply of petitioners Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Wayne N. Outten
    Counsel of Record
Outten & Golden LLP
685 3rd Avenue
25th Floor
New York, NY 10017

WNO@outtengolden.com
2122451000
Party name: Maxcimo Scott, et al.
Other
Paul DeCamp
    Counsel of Record
Epstein, Becker & Green, P.C.
1227 25th Street, N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20037

pdecamp@ebglaw.com
2028611819
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., And Restaurant Law Center
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
700 K St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The National Retail Federation
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
1500 Warner Building
150 Ottawa Avenue NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Joseph George Schmitt
    Counsel of Record
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
250 Marquette Avenue South
Suite 800
Minneapolis, MN 55401

jschmitt@nilanjohnson.com
612-305-7500
Party name: The Wage & Hour Defense Institute