No. 20-256
Title:Zavian Munize Jordan, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4751)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 31, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2020 to November 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2020.
Oct 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic; National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2020 to December 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 3, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marcia G. Shein
    Counsel of Record
Law Firm of Shein & Brandenburg
2392 North Decatur Road
Decatur, GA 30033

marcia@msheinlaw.com
4046333797
Party name: Zavian Munize Jordan
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Tiffany Regina Wright
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness Street NW
Washington, DC 20008

tiffany.wright@orrick.com
202-806-8082
Party name: Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic; National Association for Public Defense
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: FAMM