No. 20-255
Title:Mahanoy Area School District, Petitioner
v.
B. L., a Minor, By and Through Her Father, Lawrence Levy and Her Mother, Betty Lou Levy
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1842)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2020 to November 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2020.
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania School Boards Association and Pennsylvania Principals Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief of respondents B.L., a minor, by and through her father Lawrence Levy and her mother Betty Lou Levy in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2020Reply of petitioner Mahanoy Area School District filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner Mahanoy Area School District filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Brief amici curiae of Cyberbullying Research Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Nation Education Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Pupil Services Administrators and Pennsylvania Association of Pupil Services Administrators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania School Boards Association and Pennsylvania Principals Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of First Amendment and Education Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of The Huntsville, Alabama City Board of Education, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 28, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondent B.L., a minor, by and through her father Lawrence Levy and her mother Betty Lou Levy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Parents Defending Education filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Life Legal Defense Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom and Christian Legal Society filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Independent Women's Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of College Athlete Advocates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Law and Education Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation and The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Jane Bambauer, Ashutosh Bhagwat, and Eugene Volokh filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of School Discipline Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Louisiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Student School Board Members filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancement Project, Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Student Press Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of VanHo Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Mary Beth Tinker & John Tinker filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of HISD Student Congress, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Teachers, School Administrators, and the National Council of Teachers of English filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of The Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 16 2021Reply of petitioner Mahanoy Area School District filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2021Argued. For petitioner: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: David D. Cole, of Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Mahanoy Area School District
Attorneys for Respondent
Witold J. Walczak
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of Pennsylvania
P.O. Box 23058
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

vwalczak@aclupa.org
412-681-7864
Party name: B.L., a minor, by and through her father Lawrence Levy and her mother Betty Lou Levy
David D. ColeAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: B.L., a minor, by and through her father Lawrence Levy and her mother Betty Lou Levy
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Jane Bambauer, Ashutosh Bhagwat, and Eugene Volokh
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom and Christian Legal Society
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Parents Defending Education
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: Mary Beth Tinker & John Tinker
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation and The Rutherford Institute
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
2023835300
Party name: Teachers, School Administrators, and the National Council of Teachers of English
John Arak Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Mass. Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

John.Freedman@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5316
Party name: Advancement Project, Juvenile Law Center, et al.
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: National School Boards Association, et al.
Christopher Blewer Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Thompson & Horton LLP
3200 Southwest Freeway
Suite 2000
Houston, TX 77027

cgilbert@thompsonhorton.com
7135546744
Party name: National Association of Pupil Services Administrators and Pennsylvania Association of Pupil Services Administrators
Naomi Felton Gilens
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

naomi@eff.org
(415) 436-9333
Party name: The Electronic Frontier Foundation, The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law and The Pennsylvania Center for the First Amendment
Michael John Grygiel
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
54 State Street, Sixth Floor
Albany, NY 12207

grygielm@gtlaw.com
(518) 689-1400
Party name: HISD Student Congress, Kentucky Student Voice Team, March For Our Lives Action Fund, Students For A Sensible Drug Policy, and Student Voice
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: The National Women's Law Center
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Current and Former Student School Board Members
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: The Independent Women's Law Center
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, and P.J. O'Rourke
Justin F. Marceau
    Counsel of Record
University of Denver, Sturm College of Law
2250 E. Evans Avenue
Denver, CO 80210

jmarceau@law.du.edu
6172569073
Party name: College Athlete Advocates
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3818
Party name: School Discipline Professors
Douglas S. Martland
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et. al
1 Ashburton Place
20th Floor
Boston, MA 02108

douglas.martland@mass.gov
617-963-2062
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Pennsylvania School Boards Association and Pennsylvania Principals Association
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-205-8009
Party name: States of Louisiana, Arkansas, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Texas & Utah
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Education Association
1201 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7035
Party name: Nation Education Association
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
2052513000
Party name: The Huntsville, Alabama City Board of Education and Eleven Additional Alabama School Districts
David Beryl Rubin
    Counsel of Record
The Busch Law Group LLC
450 Main Street, P.O. Box 4579
Metuchen, NJ 08840

drubin@buschlawgroup.com
9088964482
Party name: Cyberbullying Research Center, Committee for Children, Council of Administrators of Special Education, Garden State Equality, The Bully Project, STOMP Out Bullying, One Circle Foundation and SEL4NJ
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Plano Pkwy, Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Darpana M. Sheth
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
510 Walnut Street
Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106

darpana.sheth@thefire.org
2157173473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, National Coalition Against Censorship, and Comic Book Legal Defense Fund
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Life Legal Defense Foundation
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street
Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center, et al.
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Professors of Law and Education
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(312) 759-5947
Party name: First Amendment and Education Law Scholars
Adam Michael Van Ho
    Counsel of Record
VanHo Law
243 Furnace Street
Suite 201
Akron, OH 44304

adam@vanholaw.com
(330) 653-8511
Party name: VanHo Law
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
202 662 5987
Party name: Student Press Law Center, et al.,