No. 20-251
Title:Willie Gipson, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2019-KH-01815)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 19 2020Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2020)
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2020 to January 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Jan 19 2021Brief of respondent State of Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the case under Rule 15.5 from February 3, 2021 to March 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until March 10, 2021 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Yaira S. Dubin
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ydubin@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Willie Gipson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: State of Louisiana