No. 20-250 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Mark Anthony Poole, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC18-245)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 2, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2020 to November 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2020.
Nov 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 7, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ze-wen Julius Chen
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

chenj@akingump.com
202-887-4475
Party name: Mark Anthony Poole
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: State of Florida