No. 20-249
Title:Doug Ommen, in His Capacity as Liquidator of CoOportunity Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Milliman, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 1, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Iowa
   Case Numbers:(18-0335)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2020Waiver of right of respondent Milliman, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 16 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Doug Ommen, In His Capacity as Liquidator of CoOportunity Health, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Thomas Raupp
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell LLP
4801 Main Street, Suite 1000
Kansas City, MO 64112

michael.raupp@huschblackwell.com
816-983-8000
Party name: Doug Ommen, In His Capacity as Liquidator of CoOportunity Health, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Reid L. Ashinoff
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1089

reid.ashinoff@dentons.com
(212) 768-6730
Party name: Milliman, Inc., et al.