No. 20-240 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Kentucky, Petitioner
v.
Larry Lamont White
Docketed:August 28, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2014-SC-000725-MR)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to October 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Franklin Kuhn
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General of Kentucky
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

matt.kuhn@ky.gov
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Kallaher Schmidt
    Counsel of Record
Department of Public Advocacy
5 Mill Creek Park, Suite 100
Frankfort, KY 40601

kathleen.schmidt@ky.gov
5025648006
Party name: Larry Lamont White