No. 20-237
Title:Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc., Petitioner
v.
William B. Sparks, et al.
Docketed:August 28, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(115,789)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to October 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2020.
Oct 28 2020Brief of respondents Willia Sparks, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2020Reply of petitioner Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay N. Varon
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
3000 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20007

jvaron@foley.com
202-672-5380
Party name: Old Republic Home Protection Company, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Ryan Deligans
    Counsel of Record
Durbin, Larimore & Bialick
920 N Harvey
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

rdeligans@dlb.net
4052049037
Party name: Willia Sparks, et al.