No. 20-234
Title:Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al., Petitioners
v.
Yolany Padilla, et al.
Docketed:August 27, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35565)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendix
Sep 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to November 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Hyrum Adams
    Counsel of Record
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
615 Second Avenue
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98104

matt@nwirp.org
206-957-8611
Party name: Yolany Padilla, et al.