No. 20-222
Title:Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Docketed:August 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3667)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2020 to October 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2020.
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Officials and Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Corporate Governance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Securities and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Financial Economists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2020Brief of respondents Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 4, 2020 to November 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until November 17, 2020 granted.
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 17 2020Reply of petitioners Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Other
Todd G. Cosenza
    Counsel of Record
Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

tcosenza@willkie.com
212-728-8677
Party name: Former SEC Officials and Law Professors
Susan E. Hurd
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

susan.hurd@alston.com
404-881-7572
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Michael Courtney Keats
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

michael.keats@friedfrank.com
(212) 859-8914
Party name: Financial Economists
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: The Society for Corporate Governance
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Jonathan K. Youngwood
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

JYoungwood@STBLAW.com
2124553539
Party name: Securities and Financial Markets Association, et al.