No. 20-219
Title:Jane Cummings, Petitioner
v.
Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C.
Docketed:August 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10169)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Brief of respondent Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 14 2020Reply of petitioner Jane Cummings filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2020The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Rozynski
    Counsel of Record
Eisenberg & Baum, LLP
24 Union Square East, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10003

arozynski@eandblaw.com
2123538700
Party name: Jane Cummings
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Scott Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Watson, Caraway, Midkiff and Luningham, LLP
306 W. 7th Street, Suite 200
Fort Worth, TX 76102

sbradley@watsoncaraway.com
(817) 870-1717
Party name: Premier Rehab Keller, P.L.L.C.