No. 20-216
Title:Prianka Bose, Petitioner
v.
Roberto de la Salud Bea, et al.
Docketed:August 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5936)
   Decision Date:January 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Prianka Bose
Blanket Consent
Sep 16 2020Motion of respondent Rhodes College to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2020 to November 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 27, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029426234
Party name: Prianka Bose
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Rhodes College