No. 20-202
Title:Robert Massie, Petitioner
v.
Basilea Mena
Docketed:August 21, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15214)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Basilea Mena to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 21 2020Response Requested. (Due October 21, 2020)
Oct 13 2020Motion of Basilea Mena for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (October 14, 2020 - Corrected letter to be submitted)
Oct 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2020 to November 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Oct 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dennis Patrick McLaughlin
    Counsel of Record
City of Tucson Attorney's Office
P.O. Box 27210
Tucson, AZ 85726

Dennis.McLaughlin@tucsonaz.gov
520-791-4221
Party name: Robert Massie
Attorneys for Respondent
William Joseph Risner
    Counsel of Record
Risner & Graham
100 N. Stone Ave., Ste. 508
Tucson, AZ 85701

bill@risnerandgraham.com
5206227494
Party name: Basilea Mena