No. 20-197
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, et al.
Docketed:August 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1691-cv)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Brief of respondents Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2020Reply of petitioners Trump, Donald J., President for the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 28 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 04 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 10 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 18 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Trump, Donald J., President for the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jameel Jaffer
    Counsel of Record
Knight First Amendment Institute
475 Riverside Drive
Suite 302
New York, NY 10115

jameel.jaffer@knightcolumbia.org
6467458500
Party name: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, et al.