No. 20-195
Title:Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Petitioner
v.
Tulalip Tribes, et al.
Docketed:August 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35441)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 18, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2020Brief of Tulalip Tribes, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2020Waiver of Nisqually Indian Tribe of right to respond submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Muckleshoot Indian Tribe
Attorneys for Respondents
James Miller Jannetta
    Counsel of Record
Swinomish Indian Tribal Community
11404 Moorage Way
LaConner, WA 98257

jjannetta@swinomish.nsn.us
3604661134
Party name: Tulalip Tribes, et al.
Jay J. Manning
    Counsel of Record
Cascadia Law Group
606 Columbia Street NW, Suite 212
Olympia, WA 98501

jmanning@cascadialaw.com
360-786-5057
Party name: Nisqually Indian Tribe