No. 20-193 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Calvin McMillan, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:August 20, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-17-0718)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 20, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 21, 2020 to October 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 10 2020Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Calvin McMillan submitted.
Blanket Consent
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2020.
Sep 17 2020Amicus brief of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Boland Admirand
    Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
60 Walton Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30303

madmirand@schr.org
404-688-1202
Party name: Calvin McMillan
Attorneys for Respondent
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-353-2196
Party name: Alabama
Other
Daniel Scott Harawa
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
700 14th Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dharawa@naacpldf.org
2022165563
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.