No. 20-19
Title:Gary L. Jackson, Petitioner
v.
Kenneth J. Braithwaite, Secretary of the Navy
Docketed:July 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5180)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 13, 2020 to September 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 14, 2020.
Aug 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Protect Our Defendants and Black Veterans Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 14, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Oct 16 2020Brief of Braithwaite, Secretary of the United States Department of the Navy, Kenneth J. in opposition submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony F. Shelley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ashelley@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: Gary L. Jackson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Braithwaite, Secretary of the United States Department of the Navy, Kenneth J.
Other
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: Protect Our Defendants and Black Veterans Project