No. 20-183
Title:Billy D. Stair, III, Petitioner
v.
Charles Jackson
Docketed:August 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2617)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2020 to October 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 19, 2020.
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 19, 2020 to November 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 18, 2020.
Nov 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2020 to December 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 18, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: Billy D. Stair
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Charles Jackson