No. 20-182
Title:Rita Stanback, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ginny Humphrey, as Parent and Legal Guardian of Minor Child, O. H., et al.
Docketed:August 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6111, 18-6112, 18-6113, 18-6115)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edward J. McKenney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC
6060 Primacy Parkway, Suite 100
Memphis, TN 38119

emckenney@harrisshelton.com
(901)525-1455
Party name: Rita Stanback, et al.