No. 20-1817
Title:Ezaki Glico Kabushiki Kaisha, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lotte International America Corp., et al.
Docketed:June 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3010)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2021 to August 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 30, 2021.
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mondelez Global LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2021 to September 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 29, 2021.
Sep 29 2021Brief of respondents Lotte International America Corp., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Reply of petitioners Ezaki Glico Kabushiki Kaisha, d/b/a Ezaki Glico Co., Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Ezaki Glico Kabushiki Kaisha, d/b/a Ezaki Glico Co., Ltd., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mary Declan Hallerman
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
2001 K Street, N.W.
Suite 425 North
Washington, DC 20006

mhallerman@swlaw.com
202-908-4262
Party name: Lotte International America Corp., et al.
Other
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7100
Party name: Mondel─ôz Global LLC
Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
    Counsel of Record
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

ewing.bruce@dorsey.com
212-415-9200
Party name: The International Trademark Association
Richard S. Stockton
    Counsel of Record
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
71 S. Wacker Dr. Ste. 3600
Chicago, IL 60606

rstockton@bannerwitcoff.com
3124635000
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association