No. 20-18
Title:Arthur Gregory Lange, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:July 14, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A157169)
   Decision Date:October 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 11, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 13, 2020 to September 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 14, 2020.
Aug 13 2020Amicus brief of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and California Attorneys for Criminal Justice submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

bfletcher@law.stanford.edu
650-724-3345
Party name: Arthur Gregory Lange
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: State of California
Other
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and California Attorneys for Criminal Justice