No. 20-1790
Title:Alston Campbell, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1127)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner Alston Campbell, Jr.
Proof of ServiceBlanket Consent
Jul 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2021 to August 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory James DuBoff
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

gduboff@mcguirewoods.com
(804) 775-1154
Party name: Alston Campbell, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
John D. Cline
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John D. Cline
50 California Street
Suite 1500
San Francisco, CA 94111

cline@johndclinelaw.com
415-662-2260
Party name: Due Process Institute