No. 20-1788
Title:City of New York, New York, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jarrett Frost
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1163)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 21, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Jarrett Frost to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 29 2021Response Requested. (Due August 30, 2021)
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2021 to September 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 29, 2021.
Sep 29 2021Brief of respondent Jarrett Frost in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 15 2021Reply of petitioners The City of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
(212) 356-2500
Party name: The City of New York, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Jarrett Frost