No. 20-1784
Title:Ohio, Petitioner
v.
Daniel Deuble
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Ohio, Cuyahoga County
   Case Numbers:(108814)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 22, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Brief of Daniel Deuble in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Tuyen Van
    Counsel of Record
Cuyahoga County Prosecutor's Office
The Justice Center, 8th Floor
1200 Ontario Street
Cleveland, OH 44113

dvan@prosecutor.cuyahogacounty.us
216-443-7865
Party name: State of Ohio
Attorneys for Respondent
Justin Michael Weatherly
    Counsel of Record
Henderson, Mokhtari & Weatherly, Co., LPA
1231 Superior Avenue East
Cleveland, OH 44114

jw@hmwlawfirm.com
216-774-0000
Party name: Daniel Deuble