No. 20-1780
Vide 20-1530, 20-1531, 20-1778
Title:North Dakota, Petitioner
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of North Dakota
Blanket Consent
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2021, for all respondents.
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Lignite Energy Council.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Federal respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents States and Municipalities in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2021Reply of petitioner State of North Dakota filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Martin Seby
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
1144 15th Street
Suite 3300
Denver, CO 80202

sebyp@gtlaw.com
303-572-6500
Party name: State of North Dakota
Attorneys for Respondents
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States and Municipalities
Other
Michael John Nasi
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701

mnasi@jw.com
5122362216
Party name: South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., et al
Michael John Nasi
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701

mnasi@jw.com
5122362216
Party name: Lignite Energy Council