No. 20-1779
Title:Carlos A. Morales-Vázquez, Petitioner
v.
Óptima Seguros
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1503)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2021 to September 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 21, 2021.
Sep 21 2021Brief of respondent Óptima Seguros in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Reply of petitioner Carlos A. Morales-Vázquez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael F. Sturley
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

msturley@law.utexas.edu
5122321350
Party name: Carlos A. Morales-Vázquez
Attorneys for Respondent
Manuel Sosa-Baez
    Counsel of Record
Saldana, Carvajal && Velez-Rive, PSC
155 Ave. de la Constitucion
San Juan, PR 00901

msosa@scvrlaw.com
787-289-9250
Party name: Óptima Seguros
Fernando J. Collazo-ValleSaldana, Carvajal & Velez-Rive, PSC
166 Ave. de la Constitucion
San Juan, PR 00901

fcollazo@scvrlaw.com
(787) 289-9250
Party name: Óptima Seguros