No. 20-1775
Title:Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
City and County of San Francisco, California, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17213, 19-17214, 19-35914)
   Decision Date:April 8, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2021 to August 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 23 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2021Brief of respondents State of California et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2021Brief of respondents City and County of San Francisco, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2021Brief of respondents Washington et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 08 2021Reply of petitioners Arizona, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 29 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Dec 13 2021Brief of petitioners Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Arizona, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, February 23, 2022.
Dec 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Ohio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 21 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Dec 21 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Washington (Richland) is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jan 12 2022Brief of respondents City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Brief of State Respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Brief of Federal Respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2022CIRCULATED
Jan 19 2022Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 24 2022Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General GRANTED.
Feb 11 2022Reply of petitioner Arizona, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Letter of the Solicitor General updating on status of availability of NPRM text. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 23 2022Argued. For petitioners: Mark Brnovich, Attorney General, Phoenix, Ariz. For federal respondents: Brian H. Fletcher, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For state respondents: Helen H. Hong, Deputy Solicitor General, San Diego, Cal.
Jun 15 2022Writ of certiorari DISMISSED as improvidently granted. Opinion per curiam. Roberts, C. J., with whom Thomas, Alito, and Gorsuch, JJ., join, concurring.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Mark Brnovich2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

mark.brnovich@azag.gov
(602) 542-8300
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Brunn Wall Roysden IIIOffice of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

beau.roysden@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
City Hall, 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, Room 234
San Francisco, CA 94102

sara.eisenberg@sfcityatty.org
415-554-3874
Party name: City and County of San Francisco, et al.
Helen H. Hong
    Counsel of Record
Cal. Dept. of Justice, Office of Solicitor General
600 West Broadway Street, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

helen.hong@doj.ca.gov
6197389693
Party name: State of California
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: federal respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: States of Washington et al.
Other
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alaska, Kentucky, and Nebraska
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: America First Legal Foundation