No. 20-1761
Title:Jennifer Berrier, Acting Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry, Petitioner
v.
Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Commission
Docketed:June 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1898)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 19, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2021Brief of respondent Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Reply of petitioner Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Bartley DeLone
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section
15th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov
717-783-3226
Party name: Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry
Attorneys for Respondent
John Carroll Connell
    Counsel of Record
Archer & Greiner
One Centennial Square
Haddonfield, NJ 08033

jconnell@archerlaw.com
(856) 795-2121
Party name: Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Commission