No. 20-1747
Title:Erich Sorenson, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:June 16, 2021
Lower Ct:Appeals Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(19-P-1170)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 14, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2021Waiver of right of respondent Commonwealth of Massachusetts to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2021Brief amici curiae of The Charles Hamilton Houston Institute for Race and Justice et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gerard Justin Cedrone
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

gcedrone@goodwinlaw.com
617-570-1849
Party name: Erich G. Sorenson
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas Edward Bocian
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

thomas.bocian@state.ma.us
6177272200
Party name: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Other
David Joseph Feder
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 South Flower Street
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

dfeder@jonesday.com
(213) 489-3939
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: The Charles Hamilton Houston Institute for Race and Justice et al.