No. 20-1735
Title:Angel Manuel Ortiz-Diaz, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:June 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2236, 20-1084)
   Decision Date:January 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendix
Jun 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 19, 2021 to August 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 18, 2021.
Jul 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jeffrey C. Tuomala filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2021Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Puerto Rico Institute for Economic Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Hon. Rafael Hernandez-Montanez in his Official Capacity as Speaker of the P.R. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of the Senate of Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 25 2021Reply of petitioners Angel Manuel Ortiz-Diaz, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 21 2021Rescheduled.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Angel Manuel Ortiz-Diaz, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Jose Alberto Bague-Soto
    Counsel of Record
DTS Law LLC
221 Plaza, Suite 801, 221 Ponce de Leon Ave..
San Juan, PR 00917-1804

jbague@dtslaw.com
787-505-6521
Party name: The Puerto Rico Institute for Economic Liberty
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Professor Jeffrey C. Tuomala
Brian Kirk Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson St.
Ste. 1605
Chicago, IL 60604

bkelsey@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Carlos Lugo-Fiol
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 260150
San Juan, PR 00926

clugofiol@gmail.com
(787) 645-4211
Party name: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
    Counsel of Record
ML & RE Law Office
Cobian's Plaza, Suite 404
1607 Ponce De Leon Ave.
San Juan, PR 00909

jorge@mlrelaw.com
7879992972
Party name: Hon. Rafael Hernandez-Montanez in his Official Capacity as Speaker of the P.R. House of Representatives
Ruben T. Nigaglioni MignucciDTS Law LLC
221 Plaza
Suite 801
San Juan, PR 00917

rtn@nigaglionilaw.com
(787)754-8700
Party name: The Puerto Rico Institute for Economic Liberty
Edwin Quinones
    Counsel of Record
Quinones & Arbona Law Offices PSC
Doral Bank Plaza, 33 Calle Resolucion, Suite 701-A
San Juan, PR 00920

equinones@qaclaw.com
7876206776
Party name: Senate of Puerto Rico
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute