No. 20-1732
Title:Thomas Bryant Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-14267)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2021 to August 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 16, 2021.
Jul 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Rachel E. Barkow and Brent E. Newton filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2021Brief amici curiae of The American Conservative Union Foundation Nolan Center for Justice, The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Thomas Bryant, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

rick.bress@lw.com
202-637-2137
Party name: The American Conservative Union Foundation Nolan Center for Justice, The Cato Institute
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: FAMM
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Rachel E. Barkow and Brent E. Newton