No. 20-1709
Title:David Ming Pon, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11455)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 12, 2021 to August 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 11, 2021.
Jul 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Daniel Epps filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 11, 2021 to September 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 10, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 10, 2021 to October 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 12, 2021.
Oct 12 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2021Reply of petitioner David Ming Pon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: David Ming Pon
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-5600
Party name: Legal Scholars
Daniel Spencer Epps
    Counsel of Record
Washington University School of Law
1 Brookings Drive
Campus Box 1120
St. Louis,, MO 63110

epps@wustl.edu
3149353532
Party name: Professor Daniel Epps
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Cato Institute and Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers