No. 20-1704
Title:RonRico Simmons, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1757)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 5, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 9, 2021 to August 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 9, 2021.
Jul 09 2021Amicus brief of Rights Behind Bars submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2021 to September 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 8, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Simmons
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Oren Nissim Nimni
    Counsel of Record
Rights Behind Bars
416 Florida Avenue NW, #26152
Washington, DC 20001

oren@rightsbehindbars.org
(202) 540-0029
Party name: Rights Behind Bars