No. 20-1698
Title:Philip Palade, et al., Petitioners
v.
Board of Trustees University of Arkansas System, et al.
Docketed:June 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1786)
   Decision Date:November 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Board of Trustees University of Arkansas System, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2021 to August 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jun 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 9, 2021.
Jul 14 2021Brief of respondents Board of Trustees University of Arkansas System, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joseph Wayne Price II
    Counsel of Record
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
111 Center Street, Suite 1900
Little Rock, AR 72201

jprice@qgtlaw.com
5013791772
Party name: Philip Palade, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David A. Curran
    Counsel of Record
University of Arkansas, Office of the General Counsel
2404 North University Ave.
Little Rock, AR 72207

dcurran@uasys.edu
5017725789
Party name: Board of Trustees University of Arkansas System, et al.